U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00574
  • Case Name: Doe v. Lyft Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Leave to File Reply]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • August 29, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 08, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Remand]
  • August 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Docket]
  • July 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • July 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 11, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.