U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00576
  • Case Name: Deloney v. Warr Acres City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2023: [Docket]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 25, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • August 25, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • August 23, 2022: [Supplement]
  • August 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 12, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.