U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00577
  • Case Name: Arce v. Walmart Stores East LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 18, 2023: [Certificate of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 08, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • July 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 12, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • July 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 12, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.