U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00580
  • Case Name: Bruner v. LVNV Funding LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 05, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 21, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 14, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 23, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 07, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Strike]
  • September 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 02, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.