U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00583
  • Case Name: Gatewood v. Hamidiy Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Default Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 14, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.