U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00582
  • Case Name: Martin v. AHS Cushing Hospital LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 14, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.