U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00587
  • Case Name: Hardin v. Punj-Aab Trucking, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • October 25, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • October 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 13, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • August 04, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • August 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.