U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00589
  • Case Name: Wright v. Cimarex Energy Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 07, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 21, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 06, 2022: [Leave]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 08, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2022: [Receipt]
  • July 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.