U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00586
  • Case Name: Baltazar v. Oklahoma County Detention
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 14, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • July 14, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.