U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00593
  • Case Name: Huchel v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • December 01, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 01, 2022: [Reminder - General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 24, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • September 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 18, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 15, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.