U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00591
  • Case Name: Hernandez v. Stephens County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • December 14, 2022: [USCA Order]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 14, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 14, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 08, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 15, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • July 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.