U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00594
  • Case Name: Mitchell Royalty LP et al v. Ovintiv USA Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Stay Case]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 09, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.