U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00597
  • Case Name: Goodin et al v. State Auto Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Certificate]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Docket]
  • August 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • July 18, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.