U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00601
  • Case Name: Croell Inc v. Brecheisen Hay LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 07, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 05, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • October 05, 2022: [Counterclaim]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 15, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • September 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 19, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.