U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00599
  • Case Name: Riles et al v. Prater et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 02, 2022: [Mail Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 29, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • July 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 29, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.