U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00602
  • Case Name: Cook v. Avery et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 13, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • November 10, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.