U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00600
  • Case Name: Whitworth et al v. Kennedy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • July 20, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 20, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.