U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00605
  • Case Name: Scott v. LNU
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • November 01, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 12, 2022: [Brief]
  • September 12, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Amended)]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 21, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • July 21, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • July 21, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.