U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00607
  • Case Name: Parkerson v. Oklahoma County Board of Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 11, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 11, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2022: [Receipt]
  • July 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 21, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.