U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00609
  • Case Name: Brown et al v. American Economy Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2022: [Docket]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 12, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • July 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.