U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00616
  • Case Name: Schlegel v. AMNET ESOP Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 11, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 01, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.