U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00613
  • Case Name: Witherspoon et al v. Ince et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Reply]
  • December 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 26, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 12, 2022: [Certification of Issue to State Court]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 16, 2022: [Appendix]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.