U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00615
  • Case Name: Liberty Insurance Corporation v. Howell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 08, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • November 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2022: [Entry of Default]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
July, 2022
  • July 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.