U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00618
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. DeJoy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 12, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • August 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • July 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.