U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00621
  • Case Name: Jones v. Kendall et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 25, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.