U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00622
  • Case Name: Howard v. El Habti
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • December 12, 2022: [Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 26, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • July 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 26, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.