U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00623
  • Case Name: Collins v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 26, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • July 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.