U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00624
  • Case Name: Scott v. Oklahoma City City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.