U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00626
  • Case Name: Prime Insurance Company v. Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 26, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.