U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00625
  • Case Name: Daniels v. Board of Regents for the University of Oklahoma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 16, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 04, 2023: [Certificate of Counsel]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 08, 2022: [Strike]
  • December 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • November 30, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 30, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.