U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00628
  • Case Name: Gonzales v. Collins et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 03, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 27, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Receipt]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 27, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • July 27, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.