U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00627
  • Case Name: Roberts v. Brewer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 10, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • August 19, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 09, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 27, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • July 27, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.