U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00629
  • Case Name: BancCentral v. Hughbanks
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.