U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00631
  • Case Name: Payne v. Seventh Judicial District Court, Oklahoma City, Oklahoma
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Traverse]
  • October 13, 2022: [Brief]
  • October 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order for Response]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 28, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • July 28, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.