U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00633
  • Case Name: Francisco v. Pettigrew et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 29, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.