U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00636
  • Case Name: Limb v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 09, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.