U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00637
  • Case Name: Barnett v. Cousins
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Compel]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Compel]
  • December 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • July 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • July 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 29, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.