U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00638
  • Case Name: Herron v. Progressive Car Finance Llc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 04, 2023: [Leave]
  • January 04, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • November 07, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.