U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00641
  • Case Name: D & C Pride of Texas Shows Inc v. Stephens County Free Fair Board Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 24, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 01, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.