U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00640
  • Case Name: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London et al v. Cameron International Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2022: [Surreply]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 07, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 03, 2022: [Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 06, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 02, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Joinder]
  • August 29, 2022: [Remand]
  • August 29, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 19, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 10, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.