U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00645
  • Case Name: Smith v. Food Service OCDC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Receipt]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 23, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 23, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 01, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 13, 2022: [Receipt]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • August 17, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 03, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 02, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 02, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.