U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00646
  • Case Name: Rigsby v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • January 04, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • January 04, 2023: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 14, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • November 14, 2022: [USCA Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 28, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 25, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 14, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 12, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Objections]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • August 22, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 02, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.