U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00652
  • Case Name: Upchurch v. Cebridge Acquisition LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Stipulation]
October, 2022
  • October 10, 2022: [Stipulation]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.