U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00651
  • Case Name: Cooley et al v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 02, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 19, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 19, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 17, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 21, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • October 19, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan]
  • October 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 29, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 04, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.