U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00654
  • Case Name: Kemp v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 05, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.