U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00657
  • Case Name: Burgundy Lane Llc v. Federated Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 03, 2023: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 03, 2023: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 11, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 06, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 30, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 04, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.