U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00659
  • Case Name: Armenta v. Independent School District No 5 of Garvin County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 24, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 21, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Protective Order]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 02, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 14, 2022: [Service by Publication]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 01, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 01, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 04, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.