U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00660
  • Case Name: Tropicana Apartments LTD v. Axis Surplus Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Administrative Closing Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 08, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
  • September 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.