U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00658
  • Case Name: Revilla v. Whitten
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
  • October 10, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • October 10, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • August 08, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 05, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 05, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.