U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00663
  • Case Name: Van Schuyver et al v. Stitt
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.